CA AB110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1504 and 2099.10 of the Fish and Game Code, to add Section 4103.5 to the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 6103.4 and 99523 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 8012, 8016, 25173.6, 44126, 116275, 116365, 116577, 116585, and 116595 of, to amend and repeal Sections 116570 and 116580 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12723, 12726, 116565, and 116590 of, to add Section 57015 to, to add and repeal Section 57014 of, and to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 8025) of Chapter 5 of Part 2 of Division 7 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 2795, 3401, 5005, 5097.94, 21190, 25422, 25464, 25471, 25806, and 42885.5 of, to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 3130) to Chapter 1 of Division 3 of, and to repeal Section 3132 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 2827 and 2851 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 13752 of the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 110 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 110 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 18). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1486.) Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 639.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |