CA AB11 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.195 to, and to add and repeal Section 14197.07 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnosis, and Treatment Program: screening services.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] |
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 11 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB11 McCarty et al. By Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 11 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB11 McCarty et al. By Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 11 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5649.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3853.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8290 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.07 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |