CA AB1096 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2064.3, 2064.4, 7542.2, 7542.11, 7583.23, 7583.32, 7585.8, 7596.3, 7596.7, and 22963 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 671 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 13000, 32400, 32401, 44275.6, 52382, 52613, 52651, 66270.3, 68062, 68130.5, and 76140 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 241, 242, 1031, 1031.5, 3101, 8880.325, 12621, and 68109 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1596.601, 1796.22, 1796.32, and 50205 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 12693.76 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 350, 2051, and 3351 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 550 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 112, 113, 114, 530.55, 3082, 3083, 4017.1, 5025, 5026, 5071, 29505, and 33850 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 6411 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 6101 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 6403, 6801, and 8105 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 1264 and 13009 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, to amend Section 12801.7 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 219.5, 11008.13, 11008.135, 11008.17, 11104, 11266, 11450, 13300, 14007.2, 14007.5, 14007.65, 14007.7, 14007.71, 14011.2, 14011.3, 16120, 17001.6, 17001.7, 17001.8, and 17001.9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to immigration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alien: change of terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2064.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2064.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22963Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7542.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7542.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7585.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7596.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7596.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code671Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code13000Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32400Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32401Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44275.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52382Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52613Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52651Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66270.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code68062Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code68130.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code76140Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code1031Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code1031.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12621Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code241Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code242Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code3101Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68109Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8880.325Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1596.601Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1796.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1796.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50205Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code2051Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code3351Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code350Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code550Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code112Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code113Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code114Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code29505Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code3082Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code3083Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code33850Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code4017.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code5025Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code5026Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code5071Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code530.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code6403Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code6801Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code8105Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6411Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code1264Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code13009Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code6101Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code12693.76Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12801.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11008.13Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11008.135Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11008.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11104Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11266Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13300Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.65Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.71Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14011.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14011.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16120Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code17001.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code17001.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code17001.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code17001.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code219.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback