CA AB1093 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 415.20 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to service of process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Service of process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1093 Chen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1093 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1093 CHEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-24 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1932.).
2017-06-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2017-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback