CA AB109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 249, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 249, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 (Chapter 14 of the Statutes of 2017) by amending Items 0650-001-3228, 3340-001-0318, 3900-001-3228, 3900-001-3237, 3900-002-3237, 3900-101-0115, 3900-101-3119, 3960-101-0001, 4260-111-0001, 6100-101-3309, 6100-194-0001, and 6100-196-0001 of, adding Items 0540-101-3228, 0650-101-3228, 0690-101-3228, 2740-302-0044, 3340-001-3228, 3360-101-3228, 3540-001-3228, 3540-002-3228, 3600-101-3228, 3640-101-3228, 3760-101-3228, 3900-101-3117, 3970-101-3228, 4700-101-3228, 6100-301-0660, and 8570-101-3228 to, and repealing Items 0860-001-3063, 3340-001-3063, and 3540-001-3063 of, Section 2.00 of, amending Section 39.00 of, and adding Section 15.14 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 109 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB109 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 109 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB109 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 109 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 249, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 3463.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3462.) |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2945.). |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 13). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2664.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2664.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2293.) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1597.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |