CA AB109 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14670.36 to the Government Code, to amend Sections 1267.75 and 1531.15 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 4418.25, 4474.1, 4519.5, 4629, 4646.5, 4648, 4681.6, 4684.81, 4685.8, 4691.6, 4691.9, and 7505, of, to add Section 4474.11 to, and to repeal and add Section 7502.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 109 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateDied on Senate inactive file.
2015-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2015-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 18). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1486.) Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 638.)
2015-03-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-01-12AssemblyRead first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2015-01-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14670.36New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1267.75Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1531.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4418.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4474.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4474.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4519.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4629Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4646.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4648Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4681.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4684.81Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4685.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4691.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4691.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code7505Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback