CA AB109 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 585, 650, 654.1, 655.5, 729, 1282.3, 1701, 1701.1, 1960, 2052, 2315, 4324, 5536.5, 6126, 6153, 6788, 7028.16, 7739, 10238.6, 11020, 11023, 11286, 11287, 11320, 16755, 17511.9, 17550.19, 22430, and 25618 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 892, 1695.8, 1812.125, 1812.217, 2945.7, 2985.2, and 2985.3 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 2255, 2256, 6811, 6814, 8812, 8815, 12672, 12675, 22002, 25540, 27202, 28880, 29102, 29550, 31410, 31411, and 35301 of the Corporations Code, to amend Section 7054 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 18002, 18100, 18101, 18102, 18106, 18200, 18201, 18203, 18204, 18205, 18310, 18311, 18400, 18403, 18502, 18520, 18521, 18522, 18523, 18524, 18540, 18544, 18545, 18560, 18561, 18564, 18566, 18567, 18568, 18573, 18575, 18578, 18611, 18613, 18614, 18620, 18621, 18640, 18660, 18661, and 18680 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 3510, 3532, 5300, 5302, 5303, 5304, 5305, 5307, 10004, 12102, 14752, 17700, 18349.5, 18435, 22753, 22780, 31880, and 50500 of the Financial Code, to amend Sections 12004 and 12005 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 17701, 18932, 18933, 19440, 19441, and 80174 of the Food and Agriculture Code, to amend Sections 1195, 1368, 1369, 3108, 3109, 5954, 6200, 6201, 9056, 27443, and 51018.7 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 264, 310, and 668 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, to amend Sections 1390, 1522.01, 1621.5, 7051, 7051.5, 8113.5, 8785, 11100, 11100.1, 11105, 11153, 11153.5, 11162.5, 11350, 11351, 11351.5, 11352, 11353.5, 11353.6, 11353.7, 11356, 11357, 11358, 11359, 11360, 11362, 11366.5, 11366.6, 11366.8, 11370.6, 11371, 11371.1, 11374.5, 11377, 11378, 11378.5, 11379, 11379.5, 11379.6, 11380.7, 11381, 11383, 11383.5, 11383.6, 11383.7, 12401, 12700, 17061, 18124.5, 25180.7, 25189.5, 25189.6, 25189.7, 25190, 25191, 25395.13, 25515, 25541, 42400.3, 44209, 100895, 109335, 115215, 116730, 116750, 118340, and 131130 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 700, 750, 833, 1043, 1215.10, 1764.7, 1814, 1871.4, 10192.165, 11161, 11162, 11163, 11760, 11880, 12660, and 12845 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 227, 6425, and 7771 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 145, 1318, 1672, and 1673, of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 17, 18, 19.2, 33, 38, 67.5, 69, 71, 72, 72.5, 76, 95, 95.1, 96, 99, 107, 109, 113, 114, 115.1, 126, 136.7, 137, 139, 140, 142, 146a, 146e, 148, 148.1, 148.3, 148.4, 148.10, 149, 153, 156, 157, 168, 171c, 171d, 181, 182, 186.10, 186.22, 186.26, 186.28, 186.33, 191.5, 193, 193.5, 210.5, 217.1, 218.1, 219.1, 222, 237, 241.1, 241.4, 241.7, 243, 243.1, 243.6, 244.5, 245, 245.6, 246.3, 247.5, 261.5, 265, 266b, 266e, 266f, 266g, 271, 271a, 273.4, 273.6, 273.65, 273d, 278, 278.5, 280, 284, 288.2, 290.018, 290.4, 290.45, 290.46, 298.2, 299.5, 311.9, 313.4, 337.3, 337.7, 337b, 337c, 337d, 337e, 337f, 350, 367f, 367g, 368, 374.2, 374.8, 375, 382.5, 382.6, 386, 387, 399.5, 404.6, 405b, 417, 417.3, 417.6, 422, 422.7, 453, 455, 461, 463, 464, 470a, 470b, 473, 474, 478, 479, 480, 481, 483.5, 484b, 484i, 487b, 487d, 489, 496, 496a, 496d, 499c, 499d, 500, 502, 506b, 520, 529, 529a, 530.5, 532a, 532f, 533, 535, 537e, 538.5, 548, 549, 550, 551, 560, 560.4, 566, 570, 577, 578, 580, 581, 587, 587.1, 591, 593, 594, 594.3, 594.35, 594.4, 597, 597.5, 598c, 598d, 600, 601, 610, 617, 620, 621, 625b, 626.9, 626.95, 626.10, 629.84, 631, 636, 637, 647.6, 653f, 653h, 653j, 653s, 653t, 653u, 653w, 664, 666, 666.5, 667.5, 668, 800, 801, 803, 836.6, 1168, 1170, 1174.4, 1203.016, 1208.2, 1213, 1320, 1320.5, 2600, 2650, 2772, 2790, 2900.5, 2932, 3000, 3000.1, 3001, 3003, 3056, 3057, 4011.7, 4016.5, 4019, 4131.5, 4501.1, 4502, 4530, 4532, 4533, 4536, 4550, 4573, 4573.6, 4573.9, 4574, 4600, 11411, 11413, 11418, 11419, 12021, 12021.1, 12021.5, 12022, 12022.5, 12022.9, 12025, 12035, 12040, 12072, 12076, 12090, 12101, 12220, 12280, 12281, 12303.3, 12303.6, 12304, 12312, 12320, 12355, 12370, 12403.7, 12422, 12520, 18715, 18720, 18725, 18730, 18735, 18740, 20110, 22810, 22910, 23900, 25110, 25300, 25400, 25850, 27590, 28250, 29700, 30315, 30600, 30605, 30725, 31360, 32625, and 33410 of, to add Sections 17.5, 1203.018, 1230.1, 2057, 3000.08, and 3000.09 to, to add Title 2.05 (commencing with Section 3450) to Part 3 of, and to repeal Sections 3060 and 3061 of, the Penal Code, to amend Sections 10283 and 10873 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 5097.99, 14591, 25205, and 48680 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 7680, 7724, 7903, and 21407.6 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 7093.6, 9278, 14521, 16910, 18631.7, 19705, 19708, 30459.15, 32471.5, 32555, 38800, 40211.5, 41171.5, 43522.5, 43606, 45867.5, 45955, 46628, 46705, 50156.18, 55332.5, 55363, and 60637 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 2478, 2800.4, 4463, 10501, 10752, 10801, 10802, 10803, 10851, 21464, 21651, 23104, 23105, 23109, 23109.1, 23110, 23550, and 42000 of the Vehicle Code, to amend Section 13387 of the Water Code, and to amend Sections 871.5, 1001.5, 1731.5, 1768.7, 1768.85, 3002, 7326, 8100, 8101, 8103, 10980, 14107.2, 14107.3, 14107.4, and 17410 of, and to add Section 1710.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to criminal justice realignment, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Criminal justice alignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Assembly - AB 109 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB109 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB109 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Urgency Clause (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB109 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB109 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Urgency Clause (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-04-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | Measure version as amended on March 17 corrected. | |
2011-03-17 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 617.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 622.). | |
2011-03-17 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 369.) Amended pursuant to Joint Rule 23.5. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 16. Page 374.). | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-14 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-07 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-02-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-02-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 419.) | |
2011-02-18 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |