CA AB1078 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130350.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1078 FEUER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1078 Feuer Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1078 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1078 Feuer Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1078 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-09 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6798.) | |
2010-08-26 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). | |
2010-08-25 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4819.) | |
2010-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 18). | |
2010-08-18 | Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4589.) | |
2010-08-09 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1454.) | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |