CA AB107 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19136 and 19167 of, and to add Section 17052 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Personal income taxes: earned income credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 107 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 107 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 18). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1486.) Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 637.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19136 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |