CA AB1069 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 53075.5 of, and to add Sections 53075.51, 53075.52, and 53075.53 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 1808.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: taxicab transportation services.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1069 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1069 Low By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1069 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1069 Low By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1069 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3504.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 14). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3371.) |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2856.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2017-08-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1797.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1717.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53075.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53075.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 1808.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |