CA AB1063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65583.1 and 65583.2 of, and to add Section 65585.5 to, the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and Zoning Law: housing elements: accessory dwelling units: adequate site substitutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1063 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-29SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-29SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-09-14SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford.
2019-06-10SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 5).
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 1346.)
2019-03-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (March 26).
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65583.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65583.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65585.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback