CA AB1063 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17250.25 and 81703 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 20133, 20175.2, and 20209.8 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Design-build contracts: labor compliance program:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2010-01-12 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |