CA AB1061 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 625, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 625, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.40 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome Residency Law: water utility charges.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1061 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1061 Lee et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1061 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1061 Lee et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1061 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 625, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 3. Page 2463.). |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 2039.). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 4. Page 1404.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |