CA AB1057 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to armories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Armories: sales: San Diego Armory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1057 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1057 WEBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2024.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1393.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on V.A. and A. & A.R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback