CA AB1057 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 114.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and vocations: licenses: military service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1057 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1057 Medina By Lieu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1057 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2783.).
2013-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1990.).
2013-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2013-04-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.)
2013-04-25AssemblyFrom consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2013-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2013-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code114.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1057&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_bill_20130409_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_bill_20130603_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_bill_20130905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_bill_20131010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_vote_20130402_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_vote_20130417_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_vote_20130429_0104PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_vote_20130610_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_vote_20130826_0312PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1051-1100/ab_1057_vote_20130830_1015AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback