CA AB1057 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 10830, 11020, 11450, 11450.12, 11450.13, and 11451.5 of, to add Section 18900.11 to, and to repeal and add Sections 11004.1, 11265.1, 11265.2, 11265.3, and 18910 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs and Food Stamp Program: reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2010-01-31 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2009-05-28 In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2009-04-29 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-04-15 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 14).
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback