CA AB1049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12814.5 and 12816 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Driver’s licenses: renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12814.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12816 | Amended Code | Citation Text |