CA AB104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 48071, 49066.5, and 51225 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: retention, grade changes, and exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Assembly - AB 104 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB104 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Limón Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - AB 104 Lorena Gonzalez Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2021-06-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-06-21AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-06-17SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2021-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 27).
2021-05-24SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended.
2021-05-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-04-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1031.).
2021-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 7).
2021-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-27AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-01-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-01-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-01-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
2020-12-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code48071New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code49066.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code51225New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104#91CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB104

Bill Comments

feedback