CA AB1037 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 14111 of the Government Code, relating to infrastructure.
Title
Infrastructure construction: digital construction management technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1037 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1037 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1037 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1037 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1037 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2022-08-29 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4975.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1655.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on May 3 corrected. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14111 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |