CA AB1033 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65852.2 and 65852.26 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Accessory dwelling units: local ordinances: separate sale or conveyance.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1033 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1033 Ting By Blakespear (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1033 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1033 Ting By Blakespear (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1033 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 17.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2378.). |
2023-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1850.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 17). |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 19). |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65852.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |