CA AB1030 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14017 to the Government Code, relating to renewable energy projects.
Title
Renewable energy projects: Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Communications (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1030 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Communications (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1030 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 7). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U., & C. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1988.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |