CA AB103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 384 and 1010.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 11040, 11041, 11042, 11045, 24000, 69580, 69592, 69594, and 69600 of, to add Sections 15007, 15820.948, 68514, and 69614.4 to, to add Article 9 (commencing with 70500) to Chapter 5.7 of Title 8 of, to add Chapter 17.8 (commencing with Section 7310) to Division 7 of Title 1 of, to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 27770) to Part 3 of Division 2 of Title 3 of, to add and repeal Section 12532 of, and to repeal Section 11043 of, the Government Code, to add Section 329 to the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 1170.18, 1370, 1370.6, 1372, 1463.007, 1464, 1557, 2801, 2808, 3453, 5075, 6031, 6031.1, 29800, 29805, 30680, and 30900 of, to add Sections 1170.127 and 4032 to, to repeal Sections 1203.6 and 1464.2 of, and to repeal and add Section 1203.5 of, the Penal Code, to add and repeal Section 10340.1 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 13365, 13365.2, 40509, and 40509.5 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 209, 1982, 4100, 4358.5, 7228, and 7234 of, and to repeal and add Sections 270 and 271 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - AB 103 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB103 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 103 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB103 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 103 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2217.). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 2213.) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1559.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 13). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1594.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |