CA AB103 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1240, 1622, 2574, 2575, 2576, 8150.5, 8151, 8152, 8154, 8155, 35736.5, 41365, 41367, 42127, 42238.01, 42238.02, 42238.025, 42238.03, 42238.05, 42238.20, 42283, 42284, 42285, 42287, 46200, 46201, 46202, 46208, 47612, 47614.5, 47631, 48664, 49085, 52060, 52061, 52062, 52064, 52066, 52068, 52070, 52070.5, 52074, 56836.11, 70022, and 84321.6 of, to amend and repeal Sections 2558 and 47633 of, to add Section 41329.575 to, and to repeal Sections 1982, 42285.5, and 48667 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.7 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 26225, 26233, and 26235 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 115 of Chapter 47 of the Statutes of 2013, to amend Section 83 of Chapter 48 of the Statutes of 2013, and to amend Items 6110-001-0001 and 6110-280-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2013, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
School finance: local control funding formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 103 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 103 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2377.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (September 9). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Page 2190.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2190.) |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2013-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1403.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1315.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |