CA AB1024 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7198 of, to amend and renumber Sections 7195.5, 7195.7, 7196, 7196.1, 7196.2, and 7197 of, to amend, renumber, and repeal Section 7199 of, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 7195) and Article 5 (commencing with Section 7198) to Chapter 9.3 of Division 3 of, to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 7195.2), Article 3 (commencing with Section 7196), Article 4 (commencing with Section 7197), and Article 6 (commencing with Section 7199) to Chapter 9.3 of Division 3 of, and to add Sections 7195.1, 7196.4, 7198.1, and 7198.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to home inspectors.
Title
Home Inspector Licensure Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (January 14). |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7198 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7199 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |