CA AB1024 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6064 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
Attorneys: admission to practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1024 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1024 Gonzalez By Lara (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1024 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1024 Gonzalez By Lara (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1024 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3341.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (September 12). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3344.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 3344.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Taken up without reference to file by unanimous consent. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 2364.). |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2315.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2315.) |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1454.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11000.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11003.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11013.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11013.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11013.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5146 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66426 | Amended Code | Citation Text |