CA AB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26163 to the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 100000, 100002, 100004, 100010, 100014, 100024, 100028, 100032, 100034, 100038, and 100043 of, to amend the heading of Title 21 (commencing with Section 100000) of, and to add Section 100033 to, the Government Code, to add Section 19567 to, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 19285) to Chapter 5 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 1095 of, and to repeal Section 1088.9 of, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to retirement savings, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement savings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 102 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB102 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 102 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2020.
2020-06-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m.
2020-06-26AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15.).
2020-06-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16.)
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11.).
2020-06-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24).
2020-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-19SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 19).
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1178.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26163New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code100000Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100002Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100004Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100010Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100014Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100024Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100028Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100032Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100033New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code100034Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100038Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100043Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1088.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code19567New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback