CA AB102 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 15605.5, 15618.5, and 15623 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12803.2 and 15609.5 of, to add Sections 15600 and 15601 to, and to add Part 8.7 (commencing with Section 15570) and Part 9.5 (commencing with Section 15670) to Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 20 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to state government, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
The Taxpayer Transparency and Fairness Act of 2017: California Department of Tax and Fee Administration: Office of Tax Appeals: State Board of Equalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - AB 102 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB102 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 102 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB102 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 102 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2225.). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2224.) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1571.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (June 13). |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1594.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12803.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15605.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15609.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15618.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15623 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |