CA AB102 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Ayes 51. Noes 26.)
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Hearing: April 28, 2015 @ 13:30 PM in State Capitol, Room 444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8670.40 of, and to add Article 3.9 (commencing with Section 8574.30) to Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to hazardous materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad and surface transportation safety and emergency planning and response: hazardous materials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Ayes 51. Noes 26.)
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2015-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2015-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8574.30New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8670.40Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code7718Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback