CA AB1010 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 633.05 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1010 Furutani By Lieu (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1010 FURUTANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1010 FURUTANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-29 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2075.). | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 13. Page 1571.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1433.) | |
2011-04-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 26). | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 633 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 633.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |