CA AB101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Hearing: Jun 17 @ 11:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 101 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1178.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback