CA AB1007 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30061 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 749.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to local government financing.
Title
Local government financing: juvenile justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1007 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriattle="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1007 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriattle="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 2041.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 30061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 749.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |