CA AB1007 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35012 of the Education Code, relating to governing boards.
Title
Governing boards: pupil members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1007 CARTER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1007 Carter By Romero (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1007 CARTER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1007 Carter By Romero (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1007 CARTER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 3199.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2154.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-25 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 1545.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 6). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |