CA AB1006 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Hearing: May 27, 2015 @ 09:00 AM in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 1425) to Title 10 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners: mental health treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1425New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback