CA AB1002 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1033.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: interpreter costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1002 Wilk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1002 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1002 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1618.). |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1033.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |