CA AB100 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51226.7 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: ethnic studies.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51226.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8924.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |