CA AB1 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8627.7 to the Government Code, relating to water.
Title
Drought: local governments: fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - AB1 BROWN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #3 AB1 Brown (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB1 BROWN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #3 AB1 Brown (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB1 BROWN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2140.). |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1549.). |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1098.) |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8627.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |