AZ SCM1003 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - House third reading FAILED voting: (26-27-7-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - House third reading FAILED voting: (26-27-7-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Grand Canyon; monuments; rename
Title
Grand Canyon; monuments; rename
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (26-27-7-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-1-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Memorial
Geographic Features
Grand Canyon
Grand Canyon National Park
Monuments
National Treasure
Native American Names
Rename
United States Board Of Geographic Names (h)
Geographic Features
Grand Canyon
Grand Canyon National Park
Monuments
National Treasure
Native American Names
Rename
United States Board Of Geographic Names (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 826 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |