AZ HCM2009 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of agriculture; additional offices
Title
Department of agriculture; additional offices
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Andres Cano [D] | Rep. Neal Carter [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Joel John [R] | Rep. Marcelino QuiƱonez [D] | Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2022-03-31 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |