AZ HB2727 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

AHCCCS; pregnant women; dental care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AHCCCS; pregnant women; dental care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-03-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0)
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-03-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73638
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2727p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2727h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2727barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2727health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73638&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73638&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73638&billStatusActionId=195390&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73638&billStatusActionId=195395&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback