AZ HB2477 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

High school mathematics; proficiency; notification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High school mathematics; proficiency; notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateChapter 96
2018-03-29SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-27HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-08SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-05HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15708New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70530
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2477p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2477h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0096.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2477udall.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2477education.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70530&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70530&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70530&billStatusActionId=180898&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70530&billStatusActionId=180908&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70530&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70530&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70530&billStatusActionId=182683&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback