AZ HB2367 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Administration department; reporting; public debt

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administration department; reporting; public debt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-13SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-13HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-04-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-15SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18304Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
35501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411277Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69160
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2367p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2367h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2367coleman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2367government.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2367shooter se.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69160&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69160&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69160&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69160&billStatusActionId=175688&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69160&billStatusActionId=175654&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69160&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69160&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69160&billStatusActionId=176955&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback