AZ HB2301 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adoption; health information; update

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption; health information; update

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-06HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8129Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback