AZ HB2264 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Tax exemptions; dependents; inflation indexing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax exemptions; dependents; inflation indexing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431023Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback