AR SR9 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Commend The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences' Research Study Entitled "an Extended Family Model Of Diabetes Self-management Education To Reduce Disparities In A United States Pacific Islander Community".
Title
To Commend The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences' Research Study Entitled "an Extended Family Model Of Diabetes Self-management Education To Reduce Disparities In A United States Pacific Islander Community".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR9 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SR9.pdf |