AR SR44 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat This Public Health Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2023, As "children's Advocacy Center Day".
Title
To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat This Public Health Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2023, As "children's Advocacy Center Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=sr44&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSR44.pdf |