AR SR4 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Commending Arkansas Farmers, Ranchers, And Foresters For Their Vital Contributions To The Security And Economic Wellbeing Of The State And The Nation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Arkansas Farmers, Ranchers, And Foresters For Their Vital Contributions To The Security And Economic Wellbeing Of The State And The Nation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-02-10SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2015-02-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
2015-02-03SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback