AR SR34 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly; And To Provide That The Ninety-third General Assembly Will Adjourn Sine Die No Later Than October 14, 2021.
Title
To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly; And To Provide That The Ninety-third General Assembly Will Adjourn Sine Die No Later Than October 14, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-07 - Senate - Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. The resolution failed. (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. The resolution failed. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Filed |