AR SR29 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirming The Senate's Commitment To Define Marriage As The Union Of A Man And A Woman And Urging The U.s. Congress, U.s. Supreme Court, And President Of The United States To Uphold And Enforce The Defense Of Marriage Act.
Title
Reaffirming The Senate's Commitment To Define Marriage As The Union Of A Man And A Woman And Urging The U.s. Congress, U.s. Supreme Court, And President Of The United States To Uphold And Enforce The Defense Of Marriage Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR29 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SR29.pdf |