AR SR27 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage The United States Congress To Designate The Butterfield Overland Mail Trail As A National Historic Trail.
Title
To Encourage The United States Congress To Designate The Butterfield Overland Mail Trail As A National Historic Trail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR27 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SR27.pdf |