AR SR22 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Oppose The Proposed Plains & Eastern Clean Line Transmission Project; And To Encourage Federal And State Action To Prevent The Project Or Limit Its Negative Consequences.
Title
To Oppose The Proposed Plains & Eastern Clean Line Transmission Project; And To Encourage Federal And State Action To Prevent The Project Or Limit Its Negative Consequences.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Energy |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR22 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SR22.pdf |